HI SB210 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the family court to terminate parental rights if the court determines, by clear and convincing evidence, that a natural parent committed sexual assault of the other natural parent; the child was conceived as a result of the sexual assault by the parent; and termination of parental rights is in the best interests of the child, under certain conditions. Requires the family court to suspend custody and visitation, after proper filing of a petition and a hearing, to any child whose parent or legal guardian is charged for a sexual assault or other offense, under certain conditions. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Parental Rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-12SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 229) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1238 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback