HI SB212 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB212
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a lessee of Hawaiian Homelands may use the value of the lease as collateral for a loan to build a dwelling on the tract of leased land; provided that a lender who does not qualify to be a lessee of Hawaiian Homes under this Act shall not become a lessee of the respective tract of land.
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Home Lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee on HWN reconsidered its previous decison. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-14-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee on HWN will reconsider its previous decision on 01-31-19 and will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB212 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=212&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB212_.HTM |