HI SB2129 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the Uniform Regulation of Virtual Currency Businesses Act and codifies the Act into law.
Title
Relating To Virtual Currency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-02-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-02-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Division of Financial Institutions
Uniform Regulation of Virtual Currency Businesses Act
Virtual Currency
Uniform Regulation of Virtual Currency Businesses Act
Virtual Currency
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2129&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2129_.HTM |