HI SB2157 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the Department of Agriculture to support agriculture in the State. Authorizes any moneys appropriated to be transferred to the Supplemental Appropriations Act of 2020.
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2383) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1766 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).