HI SB216 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a mandatory recount of election votes and ballot measures when the margin of victory for election contests or tabulation for ballot measures is equal to or less than one hundred or one-quarter of one per cent of the votes cast, whichever is greater. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 132) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 132).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 730).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2192) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
2019-04-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in conference room 308.
2019-03-28HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1469), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-18HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 69) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 720) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 9) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback