HI SB2165 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 208, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 700).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 208, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 700).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes registration and licensure requirements, including training, instruction, and continuing education for guards and individuals acting in a guard capacity. Directs the board of private detectives and guards to make rules. New registration and licensure requirements effective July 1, 2013. Sunsets July 1, 2016. (CD1)
Title
Guards and Guard Agencies; Training, Instruction, and Continuing Education
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 208, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 700). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 208, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 462). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 108-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 108-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-19-10 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-15-10 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Herkes, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Wakai, Marumoto. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 496). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 494). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Espero, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 342). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1151-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 6:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Chang, Manahan, Sagum, Souki excused (5). | |
2010-03-17 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Herkes, Wakai, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Belatti, Karamatsu, Luke. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-11-10 2:05PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 03-11-10. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-10-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 86) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2490) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-24-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee on CPN has rescheduled its decision making 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-23-10 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-10 9:00 AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |