HI SB217 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB217
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires candidate names to be randomized on individual ballots. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Arrangement Of Candidate Names On Ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Monday, 03-16-20 at 2:00 PM. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:31PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2020-02-14 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 19) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-13-20. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2474) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB217 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC.