HI SB2194 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:35pm in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:35pm in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires birthing facilities to perform a pulse oximetry test or other medically accepted screening on newborns to screen for critical congenital heart defects. Appropriates funds to DOH for a screening program and to the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation to conduct screenings. Establishes the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund Captive Insurance Company to effectively manage the administration and financing of the current and potential future other post employee benefit obligations of the state and county governments. (SB2194 HD2)
Title
Pulse Oximetry Screening; Congenital Heart Defects; Birthing Facilities; Newborns; Appropriation; EUTF; Captive Insurance ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:35pm in conference room 229. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:35PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 8:50AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Cachola, Creagan, McDermott Members . |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Baker, Chun Oakland Co-Chairs; Kouchi, Slom Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 540). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, Jordan, Kawakami, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Oshiro, Tokioka, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, Ichiyama, Ing, Lowen, Ohno, Onishi, Say, Takayama, Yamashita voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1666-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Takayama, Tokioka; and Excused: none. |
2014-04-01 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-03-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1162-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2014-03-19 | House | Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2014-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-19-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 111) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2543) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-14 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/CPN/WAM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1946 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3