HI SB2205 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN/HSG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN/HSG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for the identification and designation of important housing lands. Defines important housing lands as public lands owned by the State that are located within 1.0 mile of any rail mass transit station and needed to promote the development of homes priced below market rates for Hawaii residents who are owner-occupants and own no other real property. Requires the State and counties to identify and designate important housing lands. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Important Housing Lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN/HSG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 155) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) S. Chang). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3364) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2885) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-20 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee on HOU has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-13-20 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-13-20 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, WAM/JDC. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM/JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HOU/PSM/EET, WAM/JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |