HI SB2209 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to upgrade the sound system in the auditorium and conference rooms at the state capitol. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Accounting And General Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2393) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Capitol Auditorium
Capitol Conference Rooms
Department of Accounting and General Services
Capitol Auditorium
Capitol Conference Rooms
Department of Accounting and General Services