HI SB222 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB222
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the excise tax rate on large cigars.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB222 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
HB331 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB331 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=222&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB222_.HTM |