HI SB223 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB223
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers operational authority over portions of the East Kauai Irrigation System operated and maintained by the East Kauai Water Users' Cooperative as of July 1, 2019, to the Department of Agriculture. Provides a conditional extension to acquire required permits. Establishes staffing positions. Authorizes general obligation bonds for a statewide irrigation system capital improvement project. Appropriates funds. (SB223 HD1)
Title
Relating To Irrigation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Cullen Co-Chairs; Nakamura, Okimoto. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 646). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Deferred one day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2084), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1672) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Holt; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-20-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 72) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1059) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 36) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB223 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 224.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
CIP
East Kauai Irrigation System
GO Bonds
HDOA
Staffing
Transfer of Operational Authority
CIP
East Kauai Irrigation System
GO Bonds
HDOA
Staffing
Transfer of Operational Authority