HI SB2233 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 047, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 047, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the sunset date of Act 119, Session Laws of Hawaii 2013, relating to the deregistration of fee non-time share interests. Clarifies the actions taken after a certificate of title for a fee time share interest is deregistered and marked canceled by the assistant registrar.
Title
Deregistration; Bureau of Conveyances; Fee Non-time Share Interests; Fee Time Share Interests
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Act 047, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147). |
2014-04-25 | House | Act 047, on 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 669). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1585-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Har, Yamane. |
2014-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-24-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Tokioka excused (2). |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1008-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-03-14 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami, Say, Fale; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Hanohano; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-14-14 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 60). |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-14. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPN/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2490) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to CPN/JDL. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2044 (Same As) 2014-02-24 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2233&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2233_.HTM |