HI SB2277 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an unlicensed mental health professional, working under the supervision of a licensed mental health professional, to provide mental health treatments or counseling services to minors without parental or legal guardian consent, knowledge, or participation. Requires a mental health professional to assist a minor with completing a non-disclosure notification form to send to covered entities, when appropriate. Requires a covered entity, upon receiving a completed notification form, to maintain confidentiality of minor-initiated mental health treatment or counseling services. Effective 1/1/2021. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Adolescent Mental Health Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2609) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-07-20 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2043 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Subjects
Confidentiality
Mental Health Professionals
Minor-Initiated Mental Health Treatment or Counseling Services
Minors
Mental Health Professionals
Minor-Initiated Mental Health Treatment or Counseling Services
Minors