HI SB2306 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes consistent the types of documents accepted as proof of domestic or sexual violence victim status.
Title
Relating To Proof Of Domestic Or Sexual Violence Victim Status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-16-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 38). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2955) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Kim. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2057 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Referred to JDC.