HI SB231 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB231
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that the youth commission administrator shall administer the youth commission. Makes an appropriation to fund one full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) permanent youth commission administrator position. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Youth Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1617), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-20-19 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 76) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1102) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB231 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).