HI SB2339 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the executive office on aging to convene a working group to update the state plan on Alzheimer's disease and related dementias by identifying the best practices and standards of dementia training in care facilities. Requires report to the legislature. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Alzheimer's Disease And Related Dementia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Thursday, 03-12-20 8:45AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 210) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2910) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2463) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 01-31-20 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-20 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HMS, CPH. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1865 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).