HI SB237 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 155, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 155, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program to generate revenue through the lease of public school lands for public purposes. Establishes the school facilities subaccount. Requires the department of education to report to the legislature. Makes an appropriation for the pilot program. (CD1)
Title
Twenty-first Century Schools; DOE; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Act 155, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Act 155, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower, Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Hashem, Ito, Johanson, Jordan, Lowen, McDermott, Thielen, Ward, Wooley voting no (15) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 19 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara, Nishihara, Solomon . 5 No(es): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kidani, Taniguchi, L. Thielen, Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 170) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 170). |
2013-04-26 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 751). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senator(s) Kidani discharged as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Takumi, Luke; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Cheape; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator Dela Cruz replaced Senator(s) Keith-Agaran as conferee(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kidani replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Evans, Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Cheape. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 510). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Carroll, Cheape, Fale, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, McKelvey, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower, Hanohano, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Carroll, Fale, Hanohano, Jordan, Lowen, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Say, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from WAL/EDN/FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1466) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Ward. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Hanohano, Takai. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Coffman, Cullen, Kawakami; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Hanohano, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/EDN/FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL/EDN/FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 98) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 600) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 200) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 01-30-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB278 (Same As) 2013-01-22 - Referred to EDN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3