HI SB2379 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 11:07AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 11:07AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Sea Grant College Program, with the Department of Health, to develop and conduct a two-year comprehensive statewide outreach program that provides science-based information and understanding of sewage contamination sources in nearshore marine areas; increases understanding of sewage capacity needs; and informs all stakeholders of appropriate solutions for cesspool conversion. Requires the Water Resources Research Center to research wastewater system technologies to determine the most cost-effective way to upgrade cesspools in Hawaii and reduce their impact on drinking water and groundwater. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Cesspools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 11:07AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HLT on Tuesday, 03-17-20 11:07AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 220) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3211) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from AEN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2657) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HRE, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1858 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - The committee(s) on EEP/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.