HI SB2383 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of public safety to review and update, at least annually, its policies and procedures governing the use of force, weapons, and equipment. Requires the law enforcement standards board to review the department's use of force training. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Less Than Lethal Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-11-20 10:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 222) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3365) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2731) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |