HI SB2386 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits any waste or disposal facility from being located in a conservation district except in emergency circumstances to mitigate significant risks to public safety and health. Requires no less than a one-half mile buffer zone around residences, schools, and hospitals for the construction, modification, or expansion of a waste or disposal facility. Specifies that "waste or disposal facility" excludes individual, state certified, non-industrial redemption centers. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Waste Management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2020-07-10HouseReceived notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632).
2020-07-10SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim. 0 Excused: none.
2020-07-08SenateOne Day Notice 07-10-20.
2020-07-08SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20.
2020-07-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 398).
2020-07-06HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Kong, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Thielen, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-07-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20.
2020-07-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1273-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-06-29HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
2020-06-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2020-05-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
2020-05-12HouseReported from WLH/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1190-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-03-13HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2020-03-13HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
2020-03-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH/EEP on Friday, 03-13-20 10:30AM in House conference room 325.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 224) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3277) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
2020-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-28-20 9:31AM in conference room 016.
2020-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:30AM in conference room 016.
2020-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-02-13SenateReported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2649) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara.
2020-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2020-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:35PM in conference room 224.
2020-01-23SenateReferred to WTL/AEN, JDC.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2442 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 5

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback