HI SB2402 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:10AM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes a court to order the forfeiture of Employees' Retirement System benefits of an ERS member, former member, or retirant upon conviction of the individual for a felony related to the State or county employment of the individual. Authorizes designated beneficiaries to receive ERS benefits upon the death of the ERS member, former member, or retirant convicted of the felony. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:10AM in conference room 309.
2020-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-17-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 227) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3278) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2020-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:15PM in conference room 016.
2020-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-02-14SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2857) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2020-01-30SenateRe-Referred to LCA, JDC.
2020-01-23SenateReferred to LCA/PSM, JDC.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback