HI SB2408 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 260, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 260, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act. Establishes procedures and remedies for use in actions for partition of real property involving heirs property, real property held in tenancy in common that meets certain requirements. Effective 1/1/2017. (CD1)
Title
Real Property; Partition; Heirs Property; Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 260, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 260, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Oshiro voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 46-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 46-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-16 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-16 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 533). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1677-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-31-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1301-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 03-23-16 at 2:00PM. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-16 2:00PM. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 160) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2613) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, K.Kahele, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Kim, Slom. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee on JDL has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2042) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2175 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).