HI SB2409 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation a current and returning resident down payment program to provide matching funds for the down payment on a primary residence. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD3)
Title
Relating To Down Payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 521) in amended form (SD 3). |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) S. Chang, Harimoto, Kidani). Transmitted to House. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-20. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report filed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 3 offered. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3383) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-20 11:05AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2406) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |