HI SB2413 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits long distance running event organizers from allowing minors to register unless the minors will be eighteen years or older on the scheduled date of the running event.
Title
Relating To Long Distance Running Events.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 3:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS/ETT, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2413&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2413_.HTM |