HI SB242 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a task force to review policy issues and opportunities relating to the navigation, access, and coverage of medicaid services by individuals with autism or fetal alcohol spectrum disorder and make a recommendation on whether a waiver or other approval from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services is necessary to ensure accessibility of certain services for individuals with autism or fetal alcohol spectrum disorder. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HouseRecommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused.
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 115) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 115).
2019-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Cachola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
2019-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 2:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-19 2:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-19 2:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Baker, Riviere Co-Chairs; L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Cachola, Ward.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 648).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2070), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1603) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1322) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-08HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 78) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, J.Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 853) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-13SenateReported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 298) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara, L. Thielen.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB42 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback