HI SB2457 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-Referred to TRS/EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-Referred to TRS/EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of transportation to install two hundred fast charge electric vehicle charge systems by December 31, 2021, and an additional one thousand fast charge electric vehicle charging systems by December 31, 2025, upon certain conditions.
Title
Relating To Fast Charge Electric Vehicle Charging Systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS/EET, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM/EET, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2457&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2457_.HTM |