HI SB248 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires government entities that engage in search and rescue operations to seek reimbursement when the rescued person required search and rescue efforts because that person acted in disregard of that person's safety, including intentionally disregarding a warning or notice. Increases the penalty for unlawfully entering or remaining on a trail that has been closed to the public.
Title
Relating To Trails.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 595) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB248 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Closed to the Public
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Penalties
Search and Rescue
State Land
Trails
Trespassing
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Penalties
Search and Rescue
State Land
Trails
Trespassing
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=248&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB248_.HTM |