HI SB25 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 070, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends various portions of the Hawaii Insurance Code under title 24, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to update and improve existing Insurance Code provisions. Establishes requirements for proposed name changes and use of a trade name or assumed name, effective 10/1/2019. Until 7/1/2024, allows the Insurance Division to create stopgap measures to implement the NAIC Health Benefit Plan Network Access and Adequacy Model Act. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 070, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171).
2019-06-12HouseAct 070, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 17) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 17).
2019-04-17HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Hashimoto, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-04-17SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
2019-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-19 2:30PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; J.Keohokalole, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Hashimoto Co-Chairs; Cabanilla Arakawa, Matsumoto.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 540).
2019-04-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1977), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1432) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Belatti.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 36) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-11SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to CPH.
2019-02-11SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 162) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to CPH.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-08-19 8:55AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback