HI SB2524 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
For purposes of a county with a population of 750,000 or more: for planned community associations, requires the owner of any parcel of land subdivided as a condominium property regime in agricultural or preservation lands to provide public notice of the sale no later than ninety days after the sale of the parcel; Prohibits residential use of sheds or other structures on agricultural lands unless permitted under county ordinances and rules; allows for county enforcement and fines for violations of the prohibition; and allows for an application for registration of a project in an agricultural district to include in its verified statement comments on the availability of supportive infrastructure, the potential impact on environmental resources, and other requirements of county ordinances and rules. (CD1)
Title
Relating To County Land Use Requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1256). |
2018-07-10 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1256). |
2018-06-25 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-18 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 158-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 158-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Gabbard, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Nishihara, Gabbard Co-Chairs; K. Rhoads, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Todd Co-Chairs; Nakamura, Yamashita. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 580). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Evans, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1989-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura, Yamashita; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:35PM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1356-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Kong, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, C. Lee, McKelvey. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 03-21-18 10:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 209) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH/PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2644) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Ihara, Ruderman. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-28-18 10:20AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/PSM/AEN deferred the measure until 02-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-18 1:25PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/PSM/AEN. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Agricultural Lands
Condominium Property Regimes
County Subdivision Requirements
Land Use
Notice
Planned Community Associations
Condominium Property Regimes
County Subdivision Requirements
Land Use
Notice
Planned Community Associations