HI SB253 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to IAC, CPC, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Codifies the substantive provisions of Executive Order No. 1802, which requires all state agencies to: contract internet-related services only with internet service providers that demonstrate and contractually agree to support and practice net neutrality principles where all internet traffic is treated equally; and add contract language and provisions to state procurement requirements that suppliers of telecommunications, internet, broadband, and data communication services shall abide by net neutrality principles. Defines "net neutrality principles". Requires DCCA director to monitor net neutrality including broadband and internet access services. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Broadband Service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 80) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 992) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2019-02-15SenateReported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 392) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
2019-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to TEC, CPH.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback