HI SB2534 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 673).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 673).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to accept cash bonds, certified copies of pre-filed bonds, and original surety or own recognizance bonds when the court is closed on weekends and holidays. Specifies from whom bail may be accepted. Requires prompt release after acceptance of bail. Requires payment of bond filing fee. (CD1)
Title
Release on Bail; Procedure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 673). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 435). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Finnegan, Marumoto voting no (2) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Sakamoto. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 126-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 126-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 3:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-20-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-19-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 575). | |
2010-04-15 | (H) House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-15-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Karamatsu, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Aquino, Souki, Thielen. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Taniguchi, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 430). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ching, Finnegan, Marumoto, Pine voting no (4) and Representative(s) Bertram, Hanohano excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1234-10), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Finnegan. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-10 7:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 847-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Wakai. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-16-10 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 329) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hemmings, Kim). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-10. | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2632) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2147) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, English, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-04-10 2:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-10 1:25pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to PSM, JGO. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |