HI SB2542 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 233, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1342).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 233, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1342).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a full funding policy and budgetary procedures for routine repair and maintenance of state-owned buildings, facilities, and improvements, including Judiciary-owned facilities. (CD1)
Title
State Facilities; Routine Repair and Maintenance; Funding Policy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 233, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1342). |
2016-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 233, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1342). |
2016-06-27 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 82-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 82-16). |
2016-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-16 3:10PM in conference room 309. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Nishimoto, Yamashita, Pouha. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Keith-Agaran, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Ihara, Slom. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 541). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1617-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Pouha. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 188) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2610) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from GVO/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2429) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL/GVO, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |