HI SB2545 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 198, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 690).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 198, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 690).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits operating hours of unlicensed bring-your-own bottle establishments. Requires brewpubs to conduct manufacturing and sales activities at one location other than at the licensee's premises, if the manufacture takes place in Hawaii and on other licensed locations of the licensee. Establishes new class 17 of bring-your-own-beverage license for counties with a population in excess of 500,000 and permissive for counties with a population of 500,000 or under. Allows patrons to bring home beer, liquor, and wine that was purchased or brought onto the premises of any class of licensee for consumption with a meal. Allows commission to deny license to any person not deemed fit and proper person to have a license. Eff 7/1/2010. (CD1)
Title
Intoxicating Liquor; Brewpub Manufacturing
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 198, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 690). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 198, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 452). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 68-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 68-10). | |
2010-04-20 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wakai, Karamatsu, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-10 3:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-19-10 3:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-16-10 10:30AM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Wakai, Karamatsu Co-Chairs; Ward. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 496). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 494). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Hemmings. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 375). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1141-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Cabanilla, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Herkes, Mizuno, Morita. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Wakai, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes, Belatti, Carroll, Mizuno, Morita. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 03-29-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 862-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Berg, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Manahan, Takai, Wakai. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Tuesday, 03-16-10 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to EBM, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 36 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 194) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Bunda, Nishihara). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2630) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Sakamoto, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee on CPN has rescheduled its decision making 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2184) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA deferred the measure until 02-10-10 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-10 2:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 2/10/2010 2:00:00 PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-10 2:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to TIA, CPN. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |