HI SB2547 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 261, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1370).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 261, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1370).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the auditor to periodically review certain exemptions, exclusions, and credits under the general excise and use taxes, public service company tax, and insurance premium tax. Takes effect on 07/01/2017. (SB2547 CD1 Proposed)
Title
Tax Exemptions, Exclusions, and Credits; Auditor Review
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 261, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1370). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 261, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1370). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing, Souki excused (2). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 121-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 121-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, DeCoite, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 3:30PM in conference room 309. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-16 3:35PM in conference room 309. |
2016-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 689). |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Galuteria. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cachola, DeCoite, Pouha. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 543). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1618-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Pouha. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 190) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2733) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Taniguchi. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |