HI SB2557 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 262, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1371).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 262, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1371).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the concussion educational program established under Act 197, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, and incorporates additional concussion protocol program requirements. Appropriates funds to develop and implement the concussion monitoring and education program for school athletics and youth athletic activities, administer concussion testing to high school student athletes, and implement a concussion awareness program for youth athletics. (CD1)
Title
Concussions; Youth; Athletics; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 262, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1371). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 262, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1371). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 85-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 85-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takumi, Nishimoto, Johanson, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Baker, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 3:30PM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Johanson, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-18 | House | Re-referred to HLT/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Baker, Tokuda Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 485). |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1610-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:31PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan. |
2016-03-22 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-23-16 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-17 | House | Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HLT/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 193) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2813) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:40AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from EDU/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2445) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-16 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |