HI SB2561 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 629).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 629).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires retailers of household appliances to conspicuously display on certain household appliances that appear in the retailer's showroom floor available energy efficiency rebates funded by the public benefits fee and Hawaii-specific energy operation costs based on a statewide average residential electricity cost for the prior calendar year. Requires the public benefits fee administrator to provide a template for the signage or text containing the information to retailers no later than 7/1/2021 and to update the signage or text at least once every five years. Effective 10/1/2020. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 629). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 402). |
2020-07-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-06 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 06-25-20. |
2020-07-06 | House | Re-referred to EDB/EEP, referral sheet 54 |
2020-06-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported from EDB/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1218-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-06-22 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Yamane, Thielen. |
2020-06-22 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-06-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/EEP on Monday, 06-22-20 11:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/EEP on Thursday, 03-19-20 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to EDB/EEP, CPC, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 41). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2966) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2471) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 2:55PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPH. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1604 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.