HI SB2571 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Act 104, 07/03/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Act 104, 07/03/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning January 1, 2021, bans the sale, offer of sale, or distribution in the State of any sunscreen that contains oxybenzone or octinoxate, or both, without a prescription issued by a licensed healthcare provider to preserve marine ecosystems. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Water Pollution.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-06 | Senate | Act 104, 07/03/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205). |
2018-07-06 | House | Act 104, on 07/03/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Kong, McDermott voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 144-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 144-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Takumi, Luke, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Baker, English, Dela Cruz, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 814). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Added: Senator Dela Cruz added as Co-Chair. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 802). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Baker, English Co-Chairs; Riviere. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 622). |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Takumi added as Co-Chair. |
2018-04-17 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 59 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Todd, Ward. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 581). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Hashem, Kong, Onishi, Takayama voting no (5) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1966-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1378-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-15-18 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-18. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 220) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2601) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-22-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2368) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |