HI SB259 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits offshore drilling for oil or natural gas in state marine waters. Prohibits issuance of permits for or in connection with the development or operation of any facility or infrastructure associated with offshore drilling for oil or natural gas in state waters. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Offshore Drilling.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-12SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 204) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback