HI SB26 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 204, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 204, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds as a subsidy to the Office of the Prosecuting Attorney for Hawaii County Career Criminal Prosecution Unit. (CD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation To The Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney For Hawaii County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 204, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 204, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 179) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 179). |
2017-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Cullen, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 11:30AM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-17 11:00AM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Kim, Inouye Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Cullen Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2017-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1752) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1271), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Morikawa. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 74) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, K. Kahele. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 379) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Ihara. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 8:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation
Career Criminal Prosecution Unit
Office of the Prosecuting Attorney for Hawaii County
Subsidy
Career Criminal Prosecution Unit
Office of the Prosecuting Attorney for Hawaii County
Subsidy