HI SB2616 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts affordable housing units, additions to existing dwelling units, accessory dwelling units, ohana dwelling units, and affordable housing projects developed by the Hawaii public housing authority from 50 per cent of school impact fee requirements. Effective 7/1/2025. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Housing Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-12-20 11:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSG, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 294) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3046) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:40PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HOU/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2868) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Dela Cruz. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HOU/EDU, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |