HI SB2638 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Notice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Notice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Part I: Establishes a petty misdemeanor offense of abuse of family or household members. Clarifies the penalties for violations. Allows a deferred acceptance of guilty plea for misdemeanor and petty misdemeanor abuse of family or household members offenses. Establishes a probationary period for abuse of family or household members. Part II: Makes consistent the types of documents accepted as proof of domestic or sexual violence victim status. Part III: Requires the judiciary to submit annual reports on the number and outcome of abuse cases. Part I sunsets 6/30/2026. Effective 1/1/2021. (HD3)
Title
Relating To Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119) |
2020-08-31 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1119) |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632). |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-10-20. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 404). |
2020-07-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1278-20) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2020-06-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-06-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1227-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-06-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Thielen. |
2020-06-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 06-24-20 3:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1048-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 311) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3262) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2331) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2067 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Subjects
Abuse of Family or Household Member
Domestic Violence
Penalties
Petty Misdemeanor
Pilot Program
Proof of Status
Sexual Violence
Victims
Domestic Violence
Penalties
Petty Misdemeanor
Pilot Program
Proof of Status
Sexual Violence
Victims