HI SB264 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical amendment to tourism law regarding development of measures of effectiveness. Removes ex-officio members from the Hawaii Tourism Authority (HTA) Board and places them in an advisory group to HTA. Expands the scope of a tourism emergency to include a national or global economic crisis. Transfers tourism-related functions from the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to HTA. Earmarks an unspecified percentage of moneys allocated to the Tourism Special Fund from the Transient Accommodations Tax to be used for tourism product development and cultural programs. (SB264 HD1)
Title
Tourism; HTA Board; Tourism Emergency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused (6). | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from TCI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1246) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Re-referred to TCI, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2009-03-23 | (H) The committees on TCI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Manahan, Tokioka, Choy, Evans, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, McKelvey, Wakai. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-23-09 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-23-09. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TCI on Monday, 03-16-09 8:30 AM in House conference room 312. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Referred to TCI, referral sheet 19 | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 20). | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) One Day Notice 02-17-09. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) Reported from TSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 63) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Galuteria, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM deferred the measure until 02-05-09 2:45 pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-09 2:45pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to TSM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |