HI SB264 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that bidders must list subcontractors in sealed bids only if the amount of the bid is $1,000,000 or more, and only if a subcontractor's value of work comprises five per cent or more of total bid amount.
Title
Public Procurement; Competitive Sealed Bidding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=264 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB264_.HTM |