HI SB2641 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts the method of calculating average weekly wages for workers' compensation claims. Effective 7/1/51. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 313) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3207) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from LCA/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2852) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, S. Chang. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 10:05AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA/JDC, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |