HI SB265 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the term "promoting prostitution in the first degree" with the term "sex trafficking," a class A felony. Includes the offense of sex trafficking in the department of the attorney general's statewide witness program. Includes the offense of sex trafficking in the list of violent crimes for which victims may be eligible for criminal injury compensation. Amends portions of certain sections, subsections, and a definition in chapter 663J, Hawaii Revised Statutes, relating to civil liability in specific cases of coercion into prostitution. Establishes a violation if the person who engaged in, or agreed or offered to engage in, sexual conduct with another person for a fee was less than eighteen years of age at the time of the offense of prostitution. Amends the offense of promoting prostitution in the second degree and the law relating to the motion to vacate a conviction of certain prostitution offenses. Includes the offense of sex trafficking in the list of covered offenses for which property is subject to forfeiture. Adds the offense of sex trafficking to the list of crimes for which an order to intercept wire, oral, or electronic communications is permitted. Amends the law relating to tier 2 offenses for the registration of sex offenders. Includes the offense of sex trafficking in the list of offenses to which deferred acceptance of guilty plea or nolo contendere plea does not apply. (CD1)
Title
Sex Trafficking
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1331). |
2015-07-13 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1331). |
2015-06-29 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1243) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/29/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243) |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 40) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 40). |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Espero, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 2:02PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Espero, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 497). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1491) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15 at 2:05 pm in room 325. |
2015-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Tuesday 03-31-15, at 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-15 at 2:10 PM in room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-27-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 95) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-03-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |