HI SB2657 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRS/EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRS/EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the sunset date of Act 168, Session laws of Hawaii 2012, exempting electric vehicles from parking fees under certain conditions until 6/30/2028. Takes effect 6/30/2020.
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS/EET, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2657&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2657_.HTM |