HI SB2659 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Act 228, 07/07/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Act 228, 07/07/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an industrial hemp pilot program to allow the cultivation of industrial hemp and distribution of its seed in Hawaii through limited activities by licensee-agents of the board of agriculture for purposes of agricultural or academic research. Appropriates funds for industrial hemp pilot program administrative costs and program coordinator and inspector positions within the department of agriculture. Repeals on June 30, 2021. (CD1)
Title
Industrial Hemp; Agriculture; Pilot Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-08 | Senate | Act 228, 07/07/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330). |
2016-07-08 | House | Act 228, on 07/07/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 88-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 88-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Keith-Agaran, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-16 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Thielen replaced Representative(s) Matsumoto as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keith-Agaran, English Co-Chairs; Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Rhoads, Onishi Co-Chairs; Belatti, Matsumoto. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 489). |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1588-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1272-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2016-03-21 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1098-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-03-17 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Ward. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 03-17-16 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 219) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2599) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2438) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to WLA, JDL/WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WLA/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |