HI SB2664 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of education to hold no less than six community forums annually, with at least one forum in each county. Requires the board to include an open forum for public comments on non-agenda items. Requires a report to the Legislature on implementing open forums. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Board Of Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1021-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Quinlan, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 03-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 323) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3125) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2366) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2510 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).