HI SB2675 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to LCA/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to LCA/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes forfeiture of certain ERS benefits, pursuant to court order, for state or county employees and designated beneficiaries who are convicted of an employment-related felony.
Title
Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LCA/JDC, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2381 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2675&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2675_.HTM |